AL SB32 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Act No. 2017-173.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Act No. 2017-173.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
High school, public, civics test required for graduation
Title
High school, public, civics test required for graduation
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Holmes (M) motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 24 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 48 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Holmes (M) motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 24 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 48 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-173. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-04-18 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 522 |
2017-04-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 521 |
2017-04-18 | House | Hall Amendment #2 Offered |
2017-04-18 | House | Holmes (M) motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 520 |
2017-04-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 519 |
2017-04-18 | House | Hall Amendment #1 Offered |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 490 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 479 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Orr fourth Substitute Offered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Orr third Substitute Further Consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Orr third Substitute Offered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 387 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Orr second Substitute Offered |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 213 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Orr first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |