AL SB319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home Builders Licensure Board, residential home builders, proof of current licensure and liability insurance provided to homeowner before beginning construction
Title
Home Builders Licensure Board, residential home builders, proof of current licensure and liability insurance provided to homeowner before beginning construction
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 616 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 615 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |