AL SB319 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Professional Bondsman, certification and examination of required, continuing education required, fees, disbursement of fees, suspension

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Bondsman, certification and examination of required, continuing education required, fees, disbursement of fees, suspension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 27 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseFurther Consideration
2013-05-20HouseEngland motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2013-05-20HouseHill motion to Table lost Roll Call 1273
2013-05-20HouseEngland motion to Carry Over Temporarily offered
2013-05-20HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2013-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-05-02SenateEngrossed
2013-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2013-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 783
2013-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-30SenateOrr motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-30SenateWhatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 674
2013-04-30SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2013-04-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2013-04-24SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-03-12SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback