AL SB318 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-396.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Consumer protection, Alabama Data Breach Notification Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer protection, Alabama Data Breach Notification Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-396.
2018-03-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled
2018-03-27HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-27SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1165
2018-03-27SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1036
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1035
2018-03-22HouseWilliams (P) Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1034
2018-03-22HouseTechnology and Research Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed
2018-03-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 571
2018-03-01SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 570
2018-03-01SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2018-03-01SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-01SenateGovernmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB318&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB318-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB318-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191867-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192523-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591721&VOTE=570&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591722&VOTE=571&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600899&VOTE=1034&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600901&VOTE=1035&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600902&VOTE=1036&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601330&VOTE=1165&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback