AL SB318 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on SB318 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on SB318 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Title
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - Love motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Love motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - McClurkin motion to Accede (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Love motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - McClurkin motion to Accede (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee on SB318 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-569. | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-05-16 | Burdine intended to vote "Nay" | |
2012-05-16 | Love motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1592 | |
2012-05-16 | Love motion to Suspend Rules adopted Roll Call 1591 | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1449 | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Report | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-05-16 | McClurkin motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1528 House appoints Love, Barton and Scott | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1339 P&PO appoints Marsh, Pittman and Sanders | |
2012-05-10 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Mitchell intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-05-10 | Ford, Jackson, Hurst and Payne inadvertently voted "Yea" and intended to vote "Nay" | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1470 | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1469 | |
2012-05-10 | Knight Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1468 | |
2012-05-10 | Todd Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Love motion to Table Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 adopted Roll Call 1467 | |
2012-05-10 | McCampbell motion to reconsider Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 tabled | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1466 | |
2012-05-10 | Love Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1465 | |
2012-05-10 | Ways and Means Education Amendment #2 Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1464 | |
2012-05-10 | Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1463 | |
2012-05-10 | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | |
2012-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 855 | |
2012-05-01 | Pittman motion to Table adopted Roll Call 854 | |
2012-05-01 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 853 | |
2012-05-01 | Pittman Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 852 | |
2012-05-01 | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |