AL SB317 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-431.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Statewide 911 Board, additional members, 911 charges per account limited, application to digital transmission links, clarified, Secs. 11-98-1, 11-98-4.1, 11-98-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide 911 Board, additional members, 911 charges per account limited, application to digital transmission links, clarified, Secs. 11-98-1, 11-98-4.1, 11-98-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Marsh substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-431.
2014-04-03HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-03SenateEnrolled
2014-04-03SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1126
2014-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
2014-03-19SenateEngrossed
2014-03-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 841
2014-03-18SenateMarsh motion to Adopt Marsh substitute adopted Roll Call 840
2014-03-18SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-18SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2014-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-18SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-18SenateMarsh first Substitute Offered
2014-03-18SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2014-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB317
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB317-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB317-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB317-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=495075&VOTE=840&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=495076&VOTE=841&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500933&VOTE=1126&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback