AL SB314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 7:17 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 7:17 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elmore Co., sheriff, authorized to sell firearms to gun dealers with active business license for one year, Act 2007-325, 2007 Reg Sess., am'd, Sec. 45-26-231.02 am'd.
Title
Elmore Co., sheriff, authorized to sell firearms to gun dealers with active business license for one year, Act 2007-325, 2007 Reg Sess., am'd, Sec. 45-26-231.02 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 7:17 p.m. on May 7, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-120. |
2020-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 502 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 447 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |