AL SB314 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2019-371.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2019-371.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation and Natural Resources, wildlife, possession for public exhibition purposes, importing of deer (cervidae), prohibited, Sec. 9-11-328 am'd.
Title
Conservation and Natural Resources, wildlife, possession for public exhibition purposes, importing of deer (cervidae), prohibited, Sec. 9-11-328 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-371. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 954 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 624 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |