AL SB314 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Class 5 municipalities, establish certified animal control officers, authorize imposition of civil penalties by

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 5 municipalities, establish certified animal control officers, authorize imposition of civil penalties by

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseFurther Consideration
2016-05-04HouseWood motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-05-04HouseWood motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-04-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2016-03-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 490
2016-03-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback