AL SB313 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2017-437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2017-437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co., sheriff, Sheriff Service of Process Fund, created, service of process, further provided for, sheriff may contract for service, fees, disposition of funds
Title
Russell Co., sheriff, Sheriff Service of Process Fund, created, service of process, further provided for, sheriff may contract for service, fees, disposition of funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-437. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 959 |
2017-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 428 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |