AL SB310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Assigned Act No. 2022-269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Assigned Act No. 2022-269.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Geneva, alcoholic beverages, sale of draft or keg beer, city council may authorize
Title
Geneva, alcoholic beverages, sale of draft or keg beer, city council may authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 794 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Sorrells motion to Adopt Roll Call 793 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 721 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 720 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Sorrells motion to Adopt Roll Call 793 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 721 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 720 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-269. |
2022-03-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794 |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 721 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |