AL SB310 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Gaming, legislative intent, definitions, provided, Alabama Gaming Commission powers and duties, further provided, advisory board created to the commission, distribution of funds to the Gaming Trust Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming, legislative intent, definitions, provided, Alabama Gaming Commission powers and duties, further provided, advisory board created to the commission, distribution of funds to the Gaming Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 953 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 952 (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 951 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 950 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
2021-04-15SenateEngrossed
2021-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 953
2021-04-13SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 952
2021-04-13SenateRoberts Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 951
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-03-18SenateReported from Tourism as Favorable
2021-03-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB310&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB310-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB310-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213106-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213214-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42426.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657838&VOTE=950&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB310&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657844&VOTE=951&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657846&VOTE=952&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657847&VOTE=953&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback