AL SB310 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Board of Pharmacy, powers and duties of board, rulemaking authority clarified with regard to anticompetitive rules that prioritize patient safety and wellness, Sec. 34-24-92.1 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Pharmacy, powers and duties of board, rulemaking authority clarified with regard to anticompetitive rules that prioritize patient safety and wellness, Sec. 34-24-92.1 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-410.
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-04-12SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 567
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 860
2016-04-12SenateBeasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 566
2016-05-04HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 859
2016-04-12SenateBeasley Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-12SenateBeasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 565
2016-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-12SenateBeasley Amendment Offered
2016-04-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2016-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13SenateEngrossed
2016-03-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB310
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB310-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=545238&VOTE=565&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=545240&VOTE=566&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=545241&VOTE=567&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552127&VOTE=859&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552128&VOTE=860&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback