AL SB310 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Forwarded to Governor on May 26, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. on May 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Forwarded to Governor on May 26, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. on May 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education employees, procedures regarding employment actions of revised, Teacher Tenure Law and Fair Dismissal Act repealed, Students First Act, Sec. 16-24B-7, 16-24-1 to 16-24-22, inclusive, 36-26-100 to 36-26-116, inclusive, repealed (2011-20831)
Title
Education employees, procedures regarding employment actions of revised, Teacher Tenure Law and Fair Dismissal Act repealed, Students First Act, Sec. 16-24B-7, 16-24-1 to 16-24-22, inclusive, 36-26-100 to 36-26-116, inclusive, repealed (2011-20831)
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Beason [R] | Sen. Slade Blackwell [R] | Sen. Gerald Dial [R] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Sen. Trip Pittman [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] | Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
Sen. Phillip Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Ruling of the Chair that amendment not germaine roll call roll vote 876 (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Lindsey motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Pittman tabled Pittman to reconsider passage vote Roll Call 621. (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Beason motion to Education substitute (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Beason motion to Table Education second Amendment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Ruling of the Chair that amendment not germaine roll call roll vote 876 (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Lindsey motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Pittman tabled Pittman to reconsider passage vote Roll Call 621. (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Beason motion to Education substitute (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Beason motion to Table Education second Amendment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Forwarded to Governor on May 26, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. on May 26, 2011 | |
2011-05-26 | Assigned Act No. 2011-270. | |
2011-05-26 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-26 | Boyd dissent filed | |
2011-05-25 | Mitchell dissent filed | |
2011-05-25 | Collins intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 881 | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 880 | |
2011-05-25 | Hubbard (J) Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | McMillan motion to Table adopted Roll Call 879 | |
2011-05-25 | Mitchell Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Mitchell intended to vote "Nay" | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 878 | |
2011-05-25 | Rogers Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Mitchell intended to vote "Nay" | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 877 | |
2011-05-25 | Burdine Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Ruling of the Chair that amendment not germane roll call roll vote 876 | |
2011-05-25 | Morrow appealed ruling of the Chair | |
2011-05-25 | Ruling of the Chair that amendment not germaine | |
2011-05-25 | Morrow Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 875 | |
2011-05-25 | Lindsey Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 874 | |
2011-05-26 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Kennedy Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 873 | |
2011-05-25 | Ford Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Hurst intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-05-26 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 872 | |
2011-05-25 | Holmes motion to Carry Over Temporarily tabled | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 620 | |
2011-05-05 | Pittman tabled Pittman to reconsider passage vote Roll Call 621. | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 619 | |
2011-05-05 | Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 618. | |
2011-05-05 | Beason first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Beason motion to Education substitute adopted Roll Call 617. | |
2011-05-05 | Beason motion to Table Education second Amendment adopted Roll Call 616. | |
2011-05-05 | Education second Amendment Offered. | |
2011-05-05 | Beason motion to Table Education first Amendment adopted Voice Vote . | |
2011-05-05 | Education first Amendment Offered. | |
2011-05-05 | Education first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |