AL SB310 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Employees' Health Insurance Plan, certain persons serving in legislative, judicial, or executive branch authorized to participate under certain conditions, Sec. 36-29-16 am'd.
Title
State Employees' Health Insurance Plan, certain persons serving in legislative, judicial, or executive branch authorized to participate under certain conditions, Sec. 36-29-16 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Fields motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Denton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Denton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2010-04-22 | Fields motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1143 | |
2010-04-22 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2010-04-22 | Denton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1186 | |
2010-04-22 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-22 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Guin to suspend rules to take up out of order adopted voice vote | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 375 | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |