AL SB31 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Distressed Institutions of Higher Education Revolving Loan Program amended, loan qualifications revised, administering agency changed
Title
Distressed Institutions of Higher Education Revolving Loan Program amended, loan qualifications revised, administering agency changed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Table - Voice Vote BK32Q4Q-1 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Waggoner substitution YS9ZN26-1 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Waggoner substitution YS9ZN26-1 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Ways and Means Education RLX3NYM-1 |
2024-03-20 | House | Ways and Means Education 3rd Amendment MB8SWH1-1 |
2024-03-20 | House | Ways and Means Education 2nd Amendment LL97WAW-1 |
2024-03-20 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Amendment 2H6CISS-1 |
2024-03-20 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Substitute KLGGUAU-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 158 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 157 YS9ZN26-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Waggoner Substitute Offered YS9ZN26-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote BK32Q4Q-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | F&TE Amendment Offered BK32Q4Q-1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted BK32Q4Q-1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Waggoner amendment adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |