AL SB31 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Truth in Music Advertising Act, established, false, deceptive, or misleading affiliation between performing group and a recording group, prohibited, penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Truth in Music Advertising Act, established, false, deceptive, or misleading affiliation between performing group and a recording group, prohibited, penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-11 Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
2010-03-11 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2010-02-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 214
2010-02-16 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-01-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback