AL SB309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to sales taxes; to provide for the additional state sales tax rate in ABC retail stores.
Title
Relating to sales taxes; to provide for the additional state sales tax rate in ABC retail stores.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1038 (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 716 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 716 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1038 |
2024-05-02 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-25 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 716 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Carried Over |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |