AL SB309 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to contracts for professional services; to amend Section 41-4-133, Code of Alabama 1975, as last amended by Act 2022-357, to provide for the procurement of certain professional service contracts based on competitive, qualification-based policies and procedures; to provide for the advertisement of such contracts; and to subject such contracts to a fee schedule established by the Division of Construction Management of the Department of Finance, with exception.
Title
Relating to contracts for professional services; to amend Section 41-4-133, Code of Alabama 1975, as last amended by Act 2022-357, to provide for the procurement of certain professional service contracts based on competitive, qualification-based policies and procedures; to provide for the advertisement of such contracts; and to subject such contracts to a fee schedule established by the Division of Construction Management of the Department of Finance, with exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Adopt NXWC8J-1 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Table (Y: 7 N: 72 NV: 23 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Adopt F60P55-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Adopt RXCQYY-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Adopt NXWC8J-1 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Table (Y: 7 N: 72 NV: 23 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Adopt F60P55-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Adopt RXCQYY-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-06 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Executive Amendment ID2921 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-31 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-31 | House | Adopt NXWC8J-1 |
2023-05-31 | House | Table |
2023-05-31 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House State Government |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Committee to House State Government |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Adopt RXCQYY-1 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Adopt F60P55-1 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate County and Municipal Government RXCQYY-1 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate County and Municipal Government F60P55-1 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |