AL SB309 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Rereferred from Calendar to C&SB
Pending: House Commerce and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Rereferred from Calendar to C&SB
Pending: House Commerce and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., severance tax proceeds, 7.5 percent for railway overpass in City of Sheffield and 7.5 percent for broadband, tax applied on all severed material, regardless of mode of transportation, const. amend.
Title
Colbert Co., severance tax proceeds, 7.5 percent for railway overpass in City of Sheffield and 7.5 percent for broadband, tax applied on all severed material, regardless of mode of transportation, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Chambliss motion to adopt Local Application Resolution Roll Call 702 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 701 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 700 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 701 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 700 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Rereferred from Calendar to C&SB |
2022-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Chambliss motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 702 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 701 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |