AL SB309 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Lottery, authorized, Alabama Lottery Corporation, powers and duties provided, distrib. of proceeds, Lottery Retailer Advisory Board, created, Alabama Education Lottery Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery, authorized, Alabama Lottery Corporation, powers and duties provided, distrib. of proceeds, Lottery Retailer Advisory Board, created, Alabama Education Lottery Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 958 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 957 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 949 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseWays and Means Education first Amendment Offered
2021-05-04HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2021-05-04HousePending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2021-05-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2021-04-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2021-04-15SenateEngrossed
2021-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 958
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 957
2021-04-13SenateMarsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-13SenateLivingston Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot 1st Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-13SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-13SenateBarfoot Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-03-18SenateReported from Tourism as Favorable
2021-03-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB309&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB309-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB309-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213102-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213102-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212292-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213748-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213995-3.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42427.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42954.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42964.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657830&VOTE=949&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB309&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657891&VOTE=957&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657918&VOTE=958&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback