AL SB309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Roll Call 777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Roll Call 777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., retirement system, definitions, pension board, qualification, elections of members, duties, Secs. 45-37-123.01, 45-37-123.21, 45-37-123.22, 45-37-123.24, 45-37-123.53, 45-37-123.54, 45-37-123.82, 45-37-123.101, 45-37-123.103, 45-37-123.104, 45-37-123.151, 45-37-123.195 am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., retirement system, definitions, pension board, qualification, elections of members, duties, Secs. 45-37-123.01, 45-37-123.21, 45-37-123.22, 45-37-123.24, 45-37-123.53, 45-37-123.54, 45-37-123.82, 45-37-123.101, 45-37-123.103, 45-37-123.104, 45-37-123.151, 45-37-123.195 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Roll Call 777 |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 590 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |