AL SB309 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:58 on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Employees' Health Insurance Plan, employees retiring after December 31, 2011, required to have at least 10 years creditable service for retiree coverage, premiums subject to sliding scale calculation, based on years of service and difference between the age of the employee at retirement and the Medicare entitlement age, false information basis for disqualification of coverage, employer contribution for non-Medicare retiree not to exceed contribution for active employee, Secs. 36-29-1, 36-29-7, 36-29-8, 36-29-10, 36-29-19.4, 36-29-19.7 am'd. (2011-20786)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employees' Health Insurance Plan, employees retiring after December 31, 2011, required to have at least 10 years creditable service for retiree coverage, premiums subject to sliding scale calculation, based on years of service and difference between the age of the employee at retirement and the Medicare entitlement age, false information basis for disqualification of coverage, employer contribution for non-Medicare retiree not to exceed contribution for active employee, Secs. 36-29-1, 36-29-7, 36-29-8, 36-29-10, 36-29-19.4, 36-29-19.7 am'd. (2011-20786)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh Substitute (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Bedford Amendment (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Rules Petition to cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11:58 on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-698.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Passed Second House
2011-06-09 Boyd intended to vote "Nay"
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1190
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-31 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-05-31 Rereferrerd from WMGF to WME
2011-05-26 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2011-05-25 Engrossed
2011-05-25 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 714
2011-05-25 Marsh Substitute adopted Roll Call 713.
2011-05-25 Bedford Amendment lost Roll Call 712.
2011-05-25 Rules Petition to cease Debate adopted Roll Call 711.
2011-05-25 Bedford Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-05-25 Marsh Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Marsh first Substitute Offered
2011-05-25 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 710
2011-05-25 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 709
2011-05-25 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 708
2011-05-25 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 707
2011-05-25 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 706
2011-05-25 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 705
2011-05-25 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2011-05-25 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-25 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Roll Call 687
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 686
2011-05-24 Third Reading Carried Over
2011-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 5 amendments
2011-03-31 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB309
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB309-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB309-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB309-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413082&VOTE=686&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413084&VOTE=687&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413899&VOTE=705&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413904&VOTE=706&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413905&VOTE=707&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413910&VOTE=708&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413936&VOTE=709&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413949&VOTE=710&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413969&VOTE=711&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413970&VOTE=712&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413971&VOTE=713&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413972&VOTE=714&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422295&VOTE=1190&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback