AL SB308 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hale Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Title
Hale Co., sheriff authorized to sell certain abandoned, unclaimed, or stolen property and firearms, notice, record keeping requirement, distribution of funds for law enforcement purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Howard motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-277. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-03-15 | House | Howard motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 801 |
2018-03-15 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 771 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2018-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 505 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |