AL SB308 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education Trust Fund, approp. for fiscal year 2017, supp. approp. for Veterans' Affairs Dept., Historical Comm. approp., use of portion for grant to Bicentennial Commission, approp. to Archives and History Dept., Historical Commission, Public Television Commission, and Council on Arts, reapprop. for bicentennial purposes, Act 2016-199, 2016 Reg Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Trust Fund, approp. for fiscal year 2017, supp. approp. for Veterans' Affairs Dept., Historical Comm. approp., use of portion for grant to Bicentennial Commission, approp. to Archives and History Dept., Historical Commission, Public Television Commission, and Council on Arts, reapprop. for bicentennial purposes, Act 2016-199, 2016 Reg Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-353.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1317
2017-05-19SenateConcurrence Requested
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1026
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025
2017-05-19HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2017-04-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 436
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-16SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback