AL SB307 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to the Department of Education and Alabama Community College System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to the Department of Education and Alabama Community College System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1023
2017-05-19HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-05-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2017-05-11SenateEngrossed
2017-05-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1044
2017-05-11SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1043
2017-05-11SenateOrr Amendment No. 2 Offered
2017-05-11SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-11SenateOrr Amendment Further Consideration
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-25SenateOrr motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-25SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2017-04-25SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-25SenateDial Substitute Further Consideration
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-04-04SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-04SenateDial Substitute Further Consideration
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-03-16SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-16SenateDial Substitute Offered
2017-03-16SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 424
2017-03-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-03-16SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-16SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2017-03-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-03-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB307&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB307-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB307-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184083-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184291-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185282-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186932-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/187032-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565695&VOTE=424&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576097&VOTE=1043&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576098&VOTE=1044&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578944&VOTE=1023&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578951&VOTE=1024&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback