AL SB307 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Council and Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review, quorum, vote requirements, Sec. 29-6-3 am'd.
Title
Legislative Council and Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review, quorum, vote requirements, Sec. 29-6-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government |
2016-04-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 797 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |