AL SB306 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Governor on May 4, 2016 at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Governor on May 4, 2016 at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipality or county, business license tax, home health agency and hospice, tax due only where headquarters or branch office is located, tax not to be levied only because of delivery of service by employees, Sec 11-51-90.4 added
Title
Municipality or county, business license tax, home health agency and hospice, tax due only where headquarters or branch office is located, tax not to be levied only because of delivery of service by employees, Sec 11-51-90.4 added
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 60 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on May 4, 2016 at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 897 |
2016-05-04 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 896 |
2016-05-04 | House | Wood Amendment Offered |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570 |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 569 |
2016-04-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Ward first Substitute Offered |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 568 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |