AL SB305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts, add'l type authorized, marina on lake, sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises and off-premises consumption, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Title
Community development districts, add'l type authorized, marina on lake, sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises and off-premises consumption, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 746 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |