AL SB305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax liability, payment of with money order or electronic funds prohibited, Sec. 40-29-70 am'd.
Title
Taxation, tax liability, payment of with money order or electronic funds prohibited, Sec. 40-29-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment |
2016-04-28 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2016-04-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-04-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 845 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |