AL SB305 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, estate within Division of Developmental Disabilities of Department of Mental Health, regulation of behavior analyst, exempting membership, powers and duties, subject to Sunset Law
Title
Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, estate within Division of Developmental Disabilities of Department of Mental Health, regulation of behavior analyst, exempting membership, powers and duties, subject to Sunset Law
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Further Consideration | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 677 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources Amendment Offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 676 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources Amendment Offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |