AL SB304 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Hale County; to provide for additional minimum qualifications for individuals elected or appointed to the office of sheriff, that the individual is a U.S. citizen, has been a resident and registered voter of Hale County for one year prior to qualifying or being appointed, is a high school graduate or the equivalent, is the age of 25 or older, has three years or more of law enforcement service, has never been convicted of a felony; and to require completion of continuing education.
Title
Relating to Hale County; to provide for additional minimum qualifications for individuals elected or appointed to the office of sheriff, that the individual is a U.S. citizen, has been a resident and registered voter of Hale County for one year prior to qualifying or being appointed, is a high school graduate or the equivalent, is the age of 25 or older, has three years or more of law enforcement service, has never been convicted of a felony; and to require completion of continuing education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 93 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House Local Legislation |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Committee to House Local Legislation |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-23 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |