AL SB304 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pistol permits, sheriff authorized to issue to resident of another county, Sec.13A-11-75 am'd.
Title
Pistol permits, sheriff authorized to issue to resident of another county, Sec.13A-11-75 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 641 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 640 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2016-05-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |