AL SB302 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-483.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-483.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public assistance, administration of Lifeline qualifying public assistance programs, Sec. 37-2A-7 am'd.
Title
Public assistance, administration of Lifeline qualifying public assistance programs, Sec. 37-2A-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-483. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1383 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184 |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1183 |
2019-05-30 | House | Lee Amendment Offered |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1182 |
2019-05-30 | House | State Government first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Placed on the Calendar |
2019-05-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 668 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |