AL SB301 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Conference Committee on SB301 2018RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Driving under the influence, ignition interlock devices, further provided, blood alcohol content (BAC) for enhancement lowered, distrib of court fees, use for bond and pretrial diversion, indigent further provided for and funded, Sec. 32-5A-191, 32-5A-191.4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving under the influence, ignition interlock devices, further provided, blood alcohol content (BAC) for enhancement lowered, distrib of court fees, use for bond and pretrial diversion, indigent further provided for and funded, Sec. 32-5A-191, 32-5A-191.4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Bussman motion to Accede (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - England motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Bussman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Mooney motion to Accede (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Bussman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateConference Committee on SB301 2018RS first Substitute Offered
2018-03-28HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-28SenateBussman motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1235 P&PO appoints P&PO appoints Senators McClendon, Bussman and Smitherman
2018-03-28SenateConference Committee Requested
2018-03-28HouseEngland motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1083 House appoints Mooney, Farley and Morrow
2018-03-28HouseMooney motion to Concur In and Adopt offered
2018-03-28HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2018-03-27SenateBussman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1160
2018-03-27SenateConference Report
2018-03-21HouseMooney motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 941 House appoints Mooney, Farley and Morrow
2018-03-21HouseConference Committee Requested
2018-03-21SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-21SenateBussman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 929 P&PO appoints McClendon, Bussman and Smitherman
2018-03-21SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 930
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 929
2018-03-20HouseMooney 2nd Amendment Offered
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 928
2018-03-20HouseMooney 1st Amendment Offered
2018-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-08HouseRereferred from Judiciary to PS&HS
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed
2018-03-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-03-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 642
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 641
2018-03-06SenateBussman second Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 640
2018-03-06SenateBussman first Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 639
2018-03-06SenateBussman Second Substitute Offered
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Table Substitute adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Reconsider Substitute adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 628
2018-03-06SenateBussman first Substitute Offered
2018-03-06SenateBussman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB301&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB301-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB301-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191628-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192637-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192637-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192647-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192753-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592946&VOTE=628&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593023&VOTE=639&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593049&VOTE=640&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593051&VOTE=641&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593052&VOTE=642&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598202&VOTE=928&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598204&VOTE=929&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598205&VOTE=930&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598361&VOTE=929&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598600&VOTE=941&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601289&VOTE=1160&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602197&VOTE=1083&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602284&VOTE=1235&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback