AL SB301 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-414.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sex offenders, notification, registration, requirements to establish residence, crimes of sexting, sexual extortion, assault with bodily fluids, directing a child to engage in sex act, and distribution of a private image created, Secs. 13A-6-122, 15-20A-4, 15-20A-5, 15-20A-7, 15-20A-8, 15-20A-10 to 15-20A-16, inclusive, 15-20A-18, 15-20A-21, 15-20A-23 to 15-20A-28, inclusive, 15-20A-31, 15-20A-32, 15-20A-34, 15-20A-37, 15-20A-42, 15-20A-43 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offenders, notification, registration, requirements to establish residence, crimes of sexting, sexual extortion, assault with bodily fluids, directing a child to engage in sex act, and distribution of a private image created, Secs. 13A-6-122, 15-20A-4, 15-20A-5, 15-20A-7, 15-20A-8, 15-20A-10 to 15-20A-16, inclusive, 15-20A-18, 15-20A-21, 15-20A-23 to 15-20A-28, inclusive, 15-20A-31, 15-20A-32, 15-20A-34, 15-20A-37, 15-20A-42, 15-20A-43 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Wood motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-414.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-19HouseWood motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1030
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-18HouseWood motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2017-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2017-04-18SenateEngrossed
2017-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 610
2017-04-13SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 609
2017-04-13SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2017-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB301&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB301-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB301-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184854-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569042&VOTE=609&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569044&VOTE=610&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579050&VOTE=1030&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback