AL SB30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Forwarded to Governor on March 17, 2022 at 10:08 a.m. on March 17, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Forwarded to Governor on March 17, 2022 at 10:08 a.m. on March 17, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump-sum payment
Title
Teachers' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump-sum payment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 584 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 487 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 486 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 485 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 362 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 361 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 360 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 487 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 486 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 485 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 362 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 361 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 360 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on March 17, 2022 at 10:08 a.m. on March 17, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-178. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-17 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 584 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 487 |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 486 |
2022-03-08 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 361 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |