AL SB30 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Assigned Act No. 2021-4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus, immunity for certain entities from claims relating to contraction of or exposure to coronovirus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus, immunity for certain entities from claims relating to contraction of or exposure to coronovirus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 71 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 70 (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 46 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Figures motion to Reconsider Roll Call 45 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 34 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 33 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-4.
2021-02-11SenateForwarded to Governor on February 11, 2021
2021-02-11SenateEnrolled
2021-02-11HouseSignature Requested
2021-02-11SenatePassed Second House
2021-02-11HouseDismukes intended to vote "Yea"
2021-02-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 71
2021-02-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 46
2021-02-04SenateFigures motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 45
2021-02-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34
2021-02-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB30&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB30-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB30-enr.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41495.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41591.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643352&VOTE=33&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB30&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643354&VOTE=34&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643394&VOTE=45&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=643397&VOTE=46&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=645260&VOTE=70&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB30&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=645448&VOTE=71&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback