AL SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-373.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-373.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court costs, civil cases, docket fee, waiver for substantial hardship, verified statement required, procedures, Sec. 12-19-70 am'd.
Title
Court costs, civil cases, docket fee, waiver for substantial hardship, verified statement required, procedures, Sec. 12-19-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-373. |
2019-05-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1180 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 906 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 905 |
2019-05-23 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 65 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 64 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Whatley Amendment Offered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ward motion to |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Whatley motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 49 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 48 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Whatley Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Whatley Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Whatley Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Whatley Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 47 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 46 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable with 2 amendments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |