AL SB30 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Comptroller, establishment and maintenance of statewide database for bids or proposals for public contracts, required, database accessible through Internet (2012-20039)
Title
State Comptroller, establishment and maintenance of statewide database for bids or proposals for public contracts, required, database accessible through Internet (2012-20039)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-407. | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-09 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-08 | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1207 | |
2012-05-08 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1331 | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1330 | |
2012-05-08 | Knight Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-02-14 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 43 | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 42 | |
2012-02-14 | Orr first Substitute Offered | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |