AL SB3 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Teachers' Retirement System, retirees, one-time lump sum retirement payment in December 2017, approp. from Edu. Trust Fund in Oct. 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' Retirement System, retirees, one-time lump sum retirement payment in December 2017, approp. from Edu. Trust Fund in Oct. 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2017-05-11SenateEngrossed
2017-05-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1032
2017-05-11SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1031
2017-05-11SenateMarsh first Substitute Offered
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback