AL SB298 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-544.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-544.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic and Community Affairs Department, Alabama Innovation Act, awarding of grants, further provided, Secs. 41-23-252, 41-23-253, 41-23-255 am'd.
Title
Economic and Community Affairs Department, Alabama Innovation Act, awarding of grants, further provided, Secs. 41-23-252, 41-23-253, 41-23-255 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1197 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 1196 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 578 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 577 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 1196 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 578 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 577 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-544. |
2021-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1197 |
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 578 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 23 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |