AL SB298 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-444.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Employees' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump-sum additional payment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump-sum additional payment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-444.
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenatePassed Second House
2015-06-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1239
2015-06-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 873
2015-05-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback