AL SB297 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Courts, circuit and district, to further provide for the jurisdiction of the circuit and district courts, Secs. 12-11-30, 12-12-30 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts, circuit and district, to further provide for the jurisdiction of the circuit and district courts, Secs. 12-11-30, 12-12-30 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-405.
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled
2019-05-31HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2019-05-31HouseFaulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1264
2019-05-31HouseHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2019-05-31SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1445
2019-05-31SenateExecutive Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateForwarded to Governor
2019-05-31HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-30SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1380
2019-05-30SenateConcurrence Requested
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1235
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1234
2019-05-30HouseFaulkner Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseFaulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1233
2019-05-30HouseJUDY 3rd Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseFaulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1232
2019-05-30HouseJUDY 2nd Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1231
2019-05-30HouseJUDY 1st Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-29HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
2019-05-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2019-05-23SenateEngrossed
2019-05-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1136
2019-05-23SenateGivhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1135
2019-05-23SenateGivhan Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB297&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB297-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201358-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202219-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202209-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202115-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202270-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202373-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623010&VOTE=1135&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623011&VOTE=1136&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626759&VOTE=1231&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626760&VOTE=1232&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626761&VOTE=1233&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626763&VOTE=1234&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626764&VOTE=1235&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626808&VOTE=1380&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627580&VOTE=1445&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627654&VOTE=1264&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback