AL SB296 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, Barber Vintage Motorsports Museum, sales and use tax exemption, to include construction materials, ad valorem tax exemption, further provided for, Sec. 40-9-25.14 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, Barber Vintage Motorsports Museum, sales and use tax exemption, to include construction materials, ad valorem tax exemption, further provided for, Sec. 40-9-25.14 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2019-05-21SenateEngrossed
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 958
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-16SenateRoberts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-16SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 858
2019-05-16SenateRoberts Amendment Offered
2019-05-16SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 857
2019-05-16SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 856
2019-05-16SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2019-05-16SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2019-04-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB296&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB296-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200631-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200650-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201113-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620159&VOTE=856&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620160&VOTE=857&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620169&VOTE=858&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621228&VOTE=958&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback