AL SB296 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offenders, notification and registration, comprehensive procedure for registration by adult and juvenile sex offenders, notification by law enforcement, employment and residency limited, registration fees authorized, Sex Offender Registration and Community Notification Act, Secs. 13A-11-200, 13A-11-201, 13A-11-202, 15-20-1 to 15-20-38, inclusive, repealed (2011-21017)
Title
Sex offenders, notification and registration, comprehensive procedure for registration by adult and juvenile sex offenders, notification by law enforcement, employment and residency limited, registration fees authorized, Sex Offender Registration and Community Notification Act, Secs. 13A-11-200, 13A-11-201, 13A-11-202, 15-20-1 to 15-20-38, inclusive, repealed (2011-21017)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-640. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 936 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1046 | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1045 | |
2011-06-01 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 557 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 556 | |
2011-05-05 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-29 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |