AL SB295 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign Finance, candidates, failure to timely file statement of appointing committee, forfeits qualification to run, Sec. 17-5-4 am'd.
Title
Campaign Finance, candidates, failure to timely file statement of appointing committee, forfeits qualification to run, Sec. 17-5-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Jones [R] | Sen. Chris Elliott [R] | Sen. Sam Givhan [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] |
Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 592 (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Jones motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB444 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections