AL SB295 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-506.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Industry Recognized and Registered Apprenticeship Program Act, Alabama Office of Apprenticeship created to administer state programs in lieu of federal office, apprenticeship tax credit and aggregate apprenticeship tax credit increases, Secs. 40-18-422, 40-18-423, 40-18-424 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Industry Recognized and Registered Apprenticeship Program Act, Alabama Office of Apprenticeship created to administer state programs in lieu of federal office, apprenticeship tax credit and aggregate apprenticeship tax credit increases, Secs. 40-18-422, 40-18-423, 40-18-424 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Baker motion to Table (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-506.
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1191
2019-05-30HouseBaker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1190
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-30HouseBaker motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-30HouseCollins Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2019-05-02SenateEngrossed
2019-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 555
2019-05-02SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 554
2019-05-02SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2019-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-04-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB295&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB295-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB295-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB295-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199819-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202297-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615348&VOTE=554&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615349&VOTE=555&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626449&VOTE=1190&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626454&VOTE=1191&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback