AL SB295 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-167.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-167.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Madison Co., noise ordinances outside municipality, co. commission authorized to enact criminal penalties
Title
Madison Co., noise ordinances outside municipality, co. commission authorized to enact criminal penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Williams (P) motion to Local Application (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-167. |
2018-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | House | Williams (P) motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 545 |
2018-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 544 |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 472 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 471 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Madison County |