AL SB295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, certain public water, sewer, gas electric, and fire protection authorities, boards, and systems eligible as government entities for state and local sales and use tax exemptions, Sec. 40-9-14.1 am'd.
Title
Taxation, certain public water, sewer, gas electric, and fire protection authorities, boards, and systems eligible as government entities for state and local sales and use tax exemptions, Sec. 40-9-14.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-03 | House | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 704 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |